Financial history UP THE CREEK

Charity number: 273222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £2.80k £5.12k £4.06k £56 £5.05k
Total expenditure £4.44k £4.07k £3.14k £472 £2.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A