CHICHESTER AREA TALKING NEWS

Charity number: 273279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £6.74k £8.39k £16.15k £5.92k £0
Total expenditure £13.60k £13.43k £16.42k £13.51k £325.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A