Financial history THE ALICE ELLEN COOPER-DEAN CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 273298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.33m £1.38m £1.43m £1.37m £1.25m
Total expenditure £1.18m £1.43m £1.41m £1.47m £1.04m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.32m £1.38m £1.43m £1.37m £1.25m
Income - Other £7.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £968.41k £1.18m £1.12m £1.17m £777.04k
Expenditure - Raising funds £213.59k £251.49k £284.38k £299.78k £263.65k
Expenditure - Governance £20.14k £33.77k £37.55k £35.60k £35.07k
Expenditure - Grants institution £930.00k £1.12m £1.07m £1.12m £731.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £213.59k £251.49k £284.38k £299.78k £263.65k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0