Trustees THE ALICE ELLEN COOPER-DEAN CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 273298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard John King Trustee 10 December 2018
None on record
Richard Martin Wedgwood Trustee 12 July 2018
None on record
LINDA JEAN BOWDITCH Trustee 21 May 2004
WEYMOUTH RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
JOHN ROBERT BARRETT BOWDITCH Trustee 15 October 2003
None on record
EMMA JANE BLACKBURN Trustee 03 February 2001
None on record
DOUGLAS JAMES EDWARD NEVILLE-JONES Trustee 29 April 1991
THE VALENTINE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time