Financial history ST PETER'S SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION MARLOW

Charity number: 273398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £23.53k £13.30k £15.67k £5.96k £1.11k
Total expenditure £15.56k £28.14k £11.58k £12.78k £1.93k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A