BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR CEMETERIES IN SOUTH ASIA

Charity number: 273422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £37.68k £32.21k £94.28k £67.93k £34.35k
Total expenditure £31.47k £53.91k £48.89k £64.77k £31.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A