BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR CEMETERIES IN SOUTH ASIA

Charity number: 273422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BRIGADIER IAN REES Trustee 26 March 2014 None on record
DR RICHARD JOHN BINGLE Trustee 26 March 2014
TRINITY CHURCH MILL HILL (UNITED REFORMED AND METHODIST) Received: On time
BARNET AND QUEENSBURY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charles Andrew George Greig Trustee 04 April 2016 None on record
Alexandra Bailey Trustee 14 April 2021 None on record
Denise Love Trustee 20 March 2019 None on record
Mr Peter Boon Trustee 26 March 2014 None on record
Paul Benjamin Dean Chair 20 March 2019
ST PETER'S AID IN SICKNESS CHARITY Received: On time
UNITED ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES Received: On time
DR ROSIE LLEWELLYN-JONES MBE Trustee 11 February 2015 None on record
Valerie Ann Haye Trustee 13 April 2016 None on record
Valmay Stella Young Trustee 20 March 2019
THE FAMILIES IN BRITISH INDIA SOCIETY Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER STUART CARNAGHAN Trustee None on record
DR ROSEMARY ANNE RAZA Trustee 13 April 2016
VIQUARAN NISA NOON AND FIROZ KHAN NOON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Mohd Yasin Zargar Trustee 15 April 2021 None on record