RIVERSIDE PARENTS, STAFF AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 273427
Charity reporting is overdue by 162 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 162 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 162 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 08 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 05 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 05 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 06 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required