THE SITTINGBOURNE SOCIETY

Charity number: 273456
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

WITHIN THE AREA OF SITTINGBOURNE, TO REVIEW PLANNING APPLICATIONS, TO RAISE AWARENESS OF MATTERS OF CONCERN OR INTEREST TO THE INHABITANTS, TO HOLD LECTURES ON MATTERS RELEVANT TO THE INHABITANTS, TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £401
Total expenditure: £457

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 May 1977: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD CALVERT Chair 15 February 2016
THE DOLPHIN SAILING BARGE MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
Malcolm Moore Trustee 22 May 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.53k £184 £71 £439 £401
Total expenditure £643 £200 £198 £379 £457
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 July 2024 272 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 July 2024 637 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 November 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Penfield Cottage
Penfield Lane
Rodmersham
Sittingbourne
ME9 0QP
Phone:
01795830329
Website:

No information available