REDE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 273479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £3.61k £3.41k £2.81k £23.16k £21.17k
Total expenditure £3.01k £3.17k £3.78k £2.65k £27.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k £18.16k