REDE VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 273479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ellen Carter-Wright Trustee 13 August 2020 None on record
Peter John Cox Trustee 05 May 2020 None on record
Susan Sykes Trustee 16 June 2021 None on record
Simon Pratten Trustee 14 May 2018 None on record
MICHAEL READ Trustee 28 September 2011 None on record