THE CANTERBURY ARTS COUNCIL

Charity number: 273591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 April 2020 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 July 2019 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 28 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required