THE CANTERBURY ARTS COUNCIL

Charity number: 273591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.38k £10.21k £9.70k £7.01k £2.12k
Total expenditure £8.56k £9.72k £7.22k £8.77k £3.83k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A