THE FESSEY PRIZE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bursaries/grants to students
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 June 1977: Standard registration
- 09 March 2012: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2007 | 31/07/2008 | 31/07/2009 | 31/07/2010 | 31/07/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34 | £35 | £34 | £72 | £39 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £56 | £50 | £50 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | 21 February 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2010 | 22 February 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | 10 February 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | 08 May 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3RD MAY 1977, AS AMENDED BY A RESOLUTION PASSED ON 18TH JULY 1994 UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74(2) (D) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
TO AWARD A PRIZE OR PRIZES TH A PERSON OR PERSONS WHO ARE STUDYING, OR HAVE BEEN SUCCESSFUL IN EXAMINATIONS RELATING TO, STATISTICS OR ECONOMICS OR COMPUTERS OR NANAGEMENT IN ANY FORM OF ADMINISTRATIVE, INDUSTRIAL OR COMMERCIAL BUSINESSOR SUCH OTHER SUBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window