Trustees THE NATIONAL SOCIETY FOR PHENYLKETONURIA (UNITED KINGDOM) LIMITED
Charity number: 273670
Charity reporting is up to date (28 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Thompson Thompson | Chair | 29 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Graham | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Louise Noble-Nesbitt | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|||||
John Skidmore | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Learoyd | Trustee | 12 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Cardy | Trustee | 14 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
DUNCAN NOBLE-NESBITT | Trustee | 15 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.