NORFOLK HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST

Charity number: 273702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 01 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 09 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 January 2018 On time Download