NORFOLK HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST

Charity number: 273702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Chris Maw Trustee 11 October 2019
SWANTON ABBOTT PARISH INSTITUTE Received: On time
Michael Launchbury Trustee 15 January 2016
THE GARAGE TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
JAMES PARRY Trustee 11 October 2019 None on record
Adam Power Trustee 11 October 2019
BANHAM COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Helen Leith Trustee 15 January 2015 None on record
Judith Harwood Chair 11 October 2019 None on record
Terry Hickman Smith Trustee 12 October 2018 None on record
Bryan Gillery Trustee 13 October 2017 None on record
Dr Richard Halsey Trustee 20 January 2017
JEWISH HERITAGE UK Received: On time
FRIENDS OF FRIENDLESS CHURCHES LIMITED Received: On time
Gerard Stamp Trustee 01 November 2021 None on record
Benjamin Finn Johnsen Trustee 25 January 2021 None on record