Accounts and annual returns EPSOM CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 273757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 04 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 05 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 13 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 13 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 01 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 01 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window