Financial history EPSOM CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 273757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £88.12k £43.78k £66.50k £30.37k £19.81k
Total expenditure £69.70k £48.94k £68.90k £40.40k £16.39k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A