Governing document FRIENDS OF WOODHOUSE COLLEGE
Charity number: 273771
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17TH MARCH 1970 AS AMENDED 28TH OCTOBER 1970, 2ND OCTOBER 1978, 5TH OCTOBER 1981 AND 15TH OCTOBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
LONDON BOROUGH OF BARNET
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.