LORETO PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 273801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 03 August 2020 180 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 20 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 04 April 2017 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required