LORETO PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 273801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £5.35k £8.04k £7.62k £14.50k £14.86k
Total expenditure £251 £671 £15.32k £7.34k £13.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A