Accounts and annual returns 1ST ICKENHAM SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 274112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 05 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window