Accounts and annual returns FRINTON-ON-SEA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 274134
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 20 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 27 April 2017 On time Download Open in new window