Trustees MOUNTVIEW ACADEMY OF THEATRE ARTS LIMITED
Charity number: 274166
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Duck | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
IAIN BARBOUR | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Mera-Nelson | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Timothy Jones | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Portia Mwangangye | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Holden | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Sheader | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Tali Pelman | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shadee Rakia Yaghoubi | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Trigg | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Enright | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAME ROSEMARY SQUIRE | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|||||
JOHN LLOYD REISS | Trustee | 22 February 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.