Accounts and annual returns EAST HENDRED WAR MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 274189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 February 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required