Accounts and annual returns THE YOUNG FOUNDATION

Charity number: 274345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 09 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window