Trustees THE YOUNG FOUNDATION

Charity number: 274345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAME JULIE MELLOR Chair 02 June 2016
Demos
Received: On time
THE INVOLVE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Dr Henry Kippin Trustee 29 October 2020
None on record
Stephen Melvyn Edward Jacobs Trustee 18 July 2019
None on record
Jonathan Mark Sobczyk Boddington Trustee 18 July 2019
None on record
KERSTEN ENGLAND Trustee 04 July 2018
None on record
Gareth Williams Trustee 09 March 2016
INSTITUTE OF COMMUNITY STUDIES
Received: On time
PETE GLADWELL Trustee 04 December 2015
INSTITUTE OF COMMUNITY STUDIES
Received: On time