LONDON RIPIENO SOCIETY

Charity number: 274377
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £4.84k £4.44k £5.01k £5.02k £2.82k
Total expenditure £4.84k £4.89k £5.19k £4.41k £2.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A