Accounts and annual returns STRATTON-ON-THE-FOSSE VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 274439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 09 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 16 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 08 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 08 October 2019 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 07 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required