Financial history STRATTON-ON-THE-FOSSE VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 274439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £12.43k £9.23k £10.68k £19.36k £21.10k
Total expenditure £8.67k £6.32k £12.31k £9.20k £8.13k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k £8.00k