WOMENS THERAPY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Women's Therapy Centre seeks to provide an accessible psychotherapy service for women witjh mental health problems who have traditionally not had access to to such a service, including: black and minority ethnic women, refugees and asylum seekers, women whose first languange is not English, women with disabilties and women on low incomes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2019
Total income includes £21,102 from 2 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 19 September 1979: Standard registration
- 12 February 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 12 February 2021: Funds transferred to 230102 THE HENRY SMITH CHARITY
- WOMEN'S THERAPY CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 30/09/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £261.39k | £279.67k | £264.87k | £252.45k | £241.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £279.67k | £262.04k | £302.13k | £333.77k | £296.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £29.00k | £45.33k | £42.17k | £37.33k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.11k | £0 | £0 | £34.06k | £21.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 September 2020 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 22 September 2020 | 54 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 07 May 2019 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 17 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 28 February 2018 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 15 November 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10TH JULY 1979 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 OCTOBER 2003 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 16 OCTOBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONG WOMEN SUFFERING FROM PSYCHOLOGICAL PROBLEMS AND STRESS BY THE PROVISION OF PERSONAL COUNSELLING AND PSYCHOTHERAPEUTIC TREATMENT, AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PSYCHOTHERAPISTS AND MENTAL HEALTH WORKERS IN THIS SUBJECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window