HOW WOOD SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 274545
Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 111 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 111 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 476 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 476 days
Annual return 31 July 2018 23 September 2019 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 16 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required