ROYAL MONMOUTHSHIRE ROYAL ENGINEERS (MILITIA) REGIMENTAL MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Museum that is open to the public from April to October during the afternoons and at weekends, giving a detailed history of Monmouth Castle and the Royal Monmouthshire Engineers (Militia) Regiment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 01 December 1977: Standard registration
- CASTLE AND REGIMENTAL MUSEUM MONMOUTH (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Captain David Bell | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
LT COL A TUGGEY | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MAJ J CHARLES | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|||||
COLONEL IAN CHRISTOPHER THOMPSON TD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.87k | £3.45k | £4.44k | £5.42k | £6.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.55k | £3.55k | £5.38k | £1.72k | £2.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2024 | 178 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST JULY 1977
Charitable objects
TO HOLD THE REGIMENTAL COLLECTION FOR THE PURPOSE OF UPHOLDING THE TRADITIONS OF THE REGIMENT AND PERPETUATING ITS DEEDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Monmouthshire Royal Engineers
(Militia)
Regimental Headquarters
Monmouth Castle
NP25 3BS
- Phone:
- 01600 772175
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window