FARMLAND RESERVE UK LIMITED

Charity number: 274605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £5.33m £5.32m £5.53m £7.38m £6.95m
Total expenditure £4.05m £4.49m £4.27m £5.94m £6.20m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £5.15m £5.21m £5.40m £7.11m £6.70m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £103.00k £52.00k £7.00k £52.00k £80.00k
Income - Other £76.00k £58.00k £124.00k £219.00k £175.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £386.00k £377.00k £468.00k £265.00k £1.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £4.12m £3.80m £5.20m £4.67m
Expenditure - Governance £9.00k £26.00k £22.00k £55.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £70.00k £0 £1.00m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £478.00k £527.00k