Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF COLOMBIA FOR SOCIAL AID

Charity number: 274778
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 November 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 November 2021 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window