Financial history FRIENDS OF COLOMBIA FOR SOCIAL AID

Charity number: 274778
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £97.67k £56.05k £137.26k £53.20k £40.61k
Total expenditure £91.77k £49.52k £151.49k £75.88k £45.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A