Trustees FRIENDS OF COLOMBIA FOR SOCIAL AID
Charity number: 274778
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Felipe Posada Amezquita | Chair | 30 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Silvia Eberstein | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Marulanda | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diana Herrera | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Parada-Rajmankina | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Xihomara Paulina Zentner | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
CLEMENCIA CORRADINE | Trustee | 17 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA ARDILA MA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.