THE UCKFIELD BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A brass band based in Uckfield, East Sussex.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
- Kent
Governance
- 23 February 1978: Standard registration
- UCKFIELD CONCERT BRASS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neal Bland | Trustee | 19 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT BROWN | Trustee | 01 November 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.86k | £2.18k | £10.61k | £9.39k | £8.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.98k | £3.79k | £5.26k | £8.01k | £8.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23RD SEPTEMBER 1977 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION UNDER SECTION 74(2)(D)(I) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 LETTER OF CONCURRENCE DATED 11TH JUNE 2007.
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A BAND FOR THE PERFORMANCE OF BAND MUSIC FOR THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION OF THE ART OF MUSIC AND INPARTICULAR BAND MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF AND APPEARANCE AT CONCERTS AND OTHER VENUES TOGETHER WITH A JUNIOR BAND FOR THE TEACHING AND TRAINGING OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN INSTRUMENT PLAYING AND MUSICAL THEORY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 FOREST VIEW
HAILSHAM
BN27 3EU
- Phone:
- 01323848700
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window