Trustees LAMBETH ORCHESTRA FUND

Charity number: 274831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rachael Morris Trustee 21 November 2021
None on record
Dr Jesus Javier Diez Aguirre Trustee 21 November 2021
None on record
Dean Rowland Minot Trustee 07 November 2019
None on record
Michael James Griffiths Trustee 07 November 2019
None on record
Sarah Phillips Trustee 07 November 2017
None on record
Jack Wilson Trustee 03 November 2016
None on record
Kimberley Godley Trustee 03 November 2016
None on record
Alexander Dottridge Trustee 03 November 2016
None on record
Nina Victoria Swann Trustee 01 October 2015
HENRY WOOD ACCOMMODATION TRUST
Received: On time