FRIENDS OF ST ALBANS MUSIC SCHOOL

Charity number: 274973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 26 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 26 April 2021 330 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 26 April 2021 696 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 20 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 26 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required