Financial history EARLS BARTON YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 275007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.42k £13.23k £10.38k £16.29k £13.98k
Total expenditure £9.95k £6.83k £12.45k £16.97k £12.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £600 N/A £600 N/A
Income from government grants £1.80k £2.30k £1.30k £2.30k £11.30k