Trustees DENNINGTON JUBILEE HALL
Charity number: 275024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frances Mary Andrews | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Pardey | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Rust | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Turner | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roy Steward | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Roy Steward | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Viscardi | Trustee | 23 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Miles Vasey Thomas | Trustee | 23 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Denton | Trustee | 23 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MABERLY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT ROUS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNY DYNE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.