BARRIE BADLAND TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GRANT MAKING
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
Governance
- 27 February 1978: Standard registration
- 22 July 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 07 December 2011: Re-registered
- 09 July 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 17 August 2015: Re-registered
- THE MECHANICAL SERVICES TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANDRA BADLAND | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SHIRLEY BADLAND-RUDDICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVEN JOHN BADLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.24k | £3.65k | £2.01k | £1.32k | £2.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.26k | £1.27k | £3.12k | £521 | £1.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 114 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 28 June 2024 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 March 2022 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 5TH DECEMBER 1977 AS AMENDED 25TH FEBRUARY 1988
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE BODIES TRUSTS ASSOCIATIONS INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS RECOGNISED AS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE BY THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BEEVER & STRUTHERS
ST. GEORGES HOUSE
215-219 CHESTER ROAD
MANCHESTER
M15 4JE
- Phone:
- 01618381802
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window