Trustees ANGLO CENTRAL AMERICAN SOCIETY
Charity number: 275099

Charity reporting is overdue by 574 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDWARD LONGHURST-PIERCE | Chair | 26 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rodrigo Serrano | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Loren Whitney Opinsky | Trustee | 03 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Illingworth | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
RAFAEL CASTRO | Trustee | 29 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEAN ELIZABETH PATERAS | Trustee | 26 July 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.