Accounts and annual returns PORTSEA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 275105
Charity reporting is overdue by 1610 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 149 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 149 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 514 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 514 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 880 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 880 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1245 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1245 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1610 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1610 days