YAXHAM VILLAGE AMENITIES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 275133
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 November 2020 18 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 19 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required