YAXHAM VILLAGE AMENITIES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 275133
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £22.26k £15.77k £17.60k £18.09k £61.87k
Total expenditure £22.94k £17.83k £17.10k £25.95k £42.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £11 N/A £36.65k