THE NORTH MYMMS YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 275285
Charity reporting is up to date (23 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 February 2021 23 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 14 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required