THE NORTH MYMMS YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 275285
Charity reporting is up to date (23 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £23.32k £22.55k £21.05k £24.33k £26.81k
Total expenditure £28.86k £20.75k £28.00k £30.42k £16.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £4.00k N/A